VA HB444 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings conducted through electronic communication means. Amends existing provisions concerning electronic meetings by keeping the provisions for electronic meetings held in response to declared states of emergency, repealing the provisions that are specific to regional and state public bodies, and allowing certain public bodies to conduct all-virtual public meetings where all of the members who participate do so remotely and that the public may access through electronic communications means. The bill excepts local governing bodies, local school boards, planning commissions, architectural review boards, zoning appeals boards, and any board with the authority to deny, revoke, or suspend a professional or occupational license from the provisions that allow public bodies to conduct all-virtual public meetings. Definitions, procedural requirements, and limitations for all-virtual public meetings are set forth in the bill, along with technical amendments. The bill has a delayed effective date of September 1, 2022. Virginia Freedom of Information Act; meetings conducted through electronic communication means. Amends existing provisions concerning electronic meetings by keeping the provisions for electronic meetings held in response to declared states of emergency, repealing the provisions that are specific to regional and state public bodies, and allowing certain public bodies to conduct all-virtual public meetings where all of the members who participate do so remotely and that the public may access through electronic communications means. The bill excepts local governing bodies, local school boards, planning commissions, architectural review boards, zoning appeals boards, and any board with the authority to deny, revoke, or suspend a professional or occupational license from the provisions that allow public bodies to conduct all-virtual public meetings. Definitions, procedural requirements, and limitations for all-virtual public meetings are set forth in the bill, along with technical amendments. The bill has a delayed effective date of September 1, 2022.
Title
Va. Freedom of Information Act; meetings conducted through electronic meetings, states of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597) | |
2022-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 597 (effective 9/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB444ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | House | Senate substitute with amendments agreed to by House 22107153D-S1 (97-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute with amendments (25-Y 15-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments HB444S1 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendment #3 by Senator Petersen agreed to |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reading of amendment #3 waived |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Amendments #1, #2 by Senator Petersen agreed to |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reading of amendments #1, #2 waived |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22107153D-S1 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22107153D-S1 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-02 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-27 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104056D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 1322.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1627.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2455 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3707.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3708.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3708.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3714 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2425 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |