VA HB444 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Parole Board; personal interviews of prisoners. Requires that at least two members of the Parole Board personally interview any prisoner eligible for parole who has served at least 20 years of his sentence and has no record of institutional violations within the five years immediately preceding the Board's review.
Title
Parole Board; personal interviews of prisoners eligible for parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 18106189D-H1 |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102157D |