VA HB438 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0270)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0270)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dam safety. Requires the Soil and Water Conservation Board to establish an incremental damage analysis procedure that provides for a new standard for the spillway design requirement. The bill requires the Board to adopt regulations that consider the impact of downstream limited-use or private roadways with low traffic volume and low public safety risk in the determination of the hazard potential classification of an impounding structure. The bill also allows an owner of a dam who has received a report from the Board containing recommendations for the correction of deficiencies in the dam to submit his own plan for such corrections. One of the two criteria for designating a dam as unsafe is changed. Currently, if there are serious deficiencies in the design or construction of the dam that, if left unaddressed, could result in a failure that may result in loss of life or damage to downstream property, the dam is cited as being unsafe. The new criterion would be that such deficiencies may result in the loss of life or "significant" damage to downstream property.
Title
Dam safety; Soil and Water Conservation Board to establish incremental damage analysis procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0270) | |
2010-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 270 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-11 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-10 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB438ER) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB438H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104610D-H1 | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104610D-H1 | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #2 Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101507D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 607.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 609 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |