VA HB436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Joint transportation meeting; National Capital Region Transportation Planning Board. Directs the Commonwealth Transportation Board to invite the National Capital Region Transportation Planning Board to participate in and present information at the joint transportation meeting held annually concerning projects in Planning District 8.
Title
National Capital Region Transportation Planning Board; joint transportation meeting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Transportation |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 Transportation Infrastructure and Funding |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103300D |