VA HB436 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act; disclosure of identifying information; pleading or affidavit. Clarifies that a hearing and written finding of the issue of the disclosure of certain identifying information of a child in a child custody proceeding shall be held and made by the court within 15 days of the filing of an affidavit that the health, safety, or liberty of a child would be jeopardized by disclosure of identifying information. Current law allows such filing to be made in the form of an affidavit or a pleading, but only applies the requirement that the court hear and decide the case within 15 days to pleadings.
Title
Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act; disclosure of identifying information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0042) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 42 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB436ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100186D |