VA HB434 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - Continued to 2015 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-03 - Continued to 2015 in Finance by voice vote
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Machinery and tools, merchants' capital and BPOL taxes; maximum rates established. Prohibits a locality from increasing its business machinery and tools tax, merchants' capital tax, and local license (BPOL) fees and taxes above the locality's rates in effect as of January 1, 2014.
Title
Machinery and tools, merchants' capital, and BPOL taxes; maximum rates established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | House | Continued to 2015 in Finance by voice vote |
2014-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote |
2014-01-30 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100780D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 3508.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3509 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 3706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB434 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB434+hil |