VA HB432 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public utilities; use of small, women-owned, or minority-owned business. Provides that in any proceeding in which the State Corporation Commission is required to determine whether costs incurred by a public utility in its delivery or provision of any goods or service are reasonable or prudent, the incremental portion of the costs incurred as a result of its contracting with a small, women-owned, or minority-owned business to deliver or provide the goods or service will not be found to be unreasonable or imprudently incurred if the costs of contracting with the small, women-owned, or minority-owned business do not exceed, by more than three percent, the costs that would have been incurred had it used the lowest-cost qualified business. The measure applies to businesses that are certified as small, women-owned, or minority-owned by the Department of Small Business and Supplier Diversity.
Title
Public utilities; contracting with small, women-owned, or minority-owned businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0744) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 744 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB432ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 20103279D-E |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB432E |
2020-01-31 | House | Amendment by Delegate Simon agreed to |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB432E |
2020-01-31 | House | Pending question ordered |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment (17-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103279D |