VA HB423 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (36-Y 59-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (36-Y 59-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Common Interest Community Board; duties. Requires the Common Interest Community Board to develop and publish best practices for declarations and develop a model declaration consistent with the best practices and the requirements of the Condominium Act (§ 55-79.39 et seq.), the Real Estate Cooperative Act (§ 55-424 et seq.), and the Property Owners' Association Act (§ 55-508 et seq.) of Title 55.
Title
Common Interest Community Board; duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (36-Y 59-N) (Y: 36 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (36-Y 59-N) | |
2012-04-18 | House: House sustained Governor's veto (36-Y 59-N) | |
2012-04-09 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB423ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2012-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-02 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-13 | House: Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102164D |