VA HB421 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allocation by CTB of funds for transit projects. Provides that, prior to the annual adoption of the Six-Year Improvement Program, the Commonwealth Transportation Board may allocate up to 20 percent of the funds in the Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund designated for capital purposes to transit operating assistance if operating funds for the next fiscal year are estimated to be less than the current fiscal year's allocation, to attempt to maintain transit operations at approximately the same level as the previous fiscal year.
Title
Transportation Board; may allocate funds in Mass Transit Fund designated for capital purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0113) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 113 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB421ER) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 3-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB421H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104535D-H1 | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104535D-H1 | |
2010-02-04 | House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #4 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103394D |