VA HB414 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Energy Plan; covenants regarding solar power; reasonable restrictions. Provides that a restriction on solar energy collection devices is not reasonable if application of the restriction to a particular proposal (i) increases the cost of installation of the solar energy collection device by five percent over the projected cost of the initially proposed installation or (ii) reduces the energy production by the solar energy collection device by 10 percent below the projected energy production of the initially proposed installation. The owner shall provide documentation prepared by an independent solar panel design specialist that is satisfactory to the community association to show that the restriction is not reasonable according to the criteria established in the bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Energy Plan; covenants regarding solar power, reasonable restrictions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-07 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0795)
2020-04-07 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 795 (effective 7/1/20)
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB414ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate (36-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
2020-02-28SenateRead third time
2020-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-03HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 4-N)
2020-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 4-N)
2020-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB414H1
2020-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106905D-H1
2020-01-31HouseRead second time
2020-01-30HouseRead first time
2020-01-28HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106905D-H1
2020-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-01-15HouseReferred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote
2020-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103320D

Same As/Similar To

SB504 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0272)

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB414&201+sum+HB414
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB414+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB414H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB414ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0795+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H1403V0003+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0065+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H14V0097+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0318+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S01V0133+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1203HB0414+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1261HB0414+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1295HB0414+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1296HB0414+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1297HB0414+HB0414
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1298HB0414+HB0414

Bill Comments

feedback