VA HB41 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Personal property tax; situs of certain motor vehicles. Provides that when a motor vehicle is normally garaged in a location different from the domicile of the owner of the vehicle due to its use by a student attending an institution of higher education, then the situs is the owner's domicile. Under current law, the situs of such vehicle is the owner's domicile only if the student is the owner.
Title
Personal property tax; situs of certain motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 97 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0651) | |
2012-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 651 (effective 7/1/12) | |
2012-03-03 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB41ER) | |
2012-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-24 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-21 | Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2012-02-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-02 | House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 5-N) | |
2012-02-02 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N) | |
2012-02-01 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2012-01-31 | House: Read first time | |
2012-01-30 | House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 | |
2011-12-14 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2011-12-14 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12100921D |