VA HB408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Green job creation tax credit; sunset. Extends the sunset date of the green job creation tax credit from January 1, 2021, to January 1, 2025. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Green job creation tax credit; extends sunset date.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. John Avoli [R] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Kathy Tran [D] | Del. Wendell Walker [R] |
Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 40-N) (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0429) | |
2020-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 429 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB408ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | House | VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (58-Y 40-N) |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-21 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2020-01-20 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-17 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N) |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100291D |