VA HB407 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Birth certificates; change of sex. Eliminates the requirement that a person provide a certified copy of an order of a court of competent jurisdiction indicating that his sex has been changed by medical procedure for amendment of a birth certificate to reflect a change of sex and authorizes the Board of Health to adopt regulations setting forth the requirements necessary for amendment of a birth certificate to reflect change of sex. The bill provides that such requirements may include a requirement that the person requesting the amendment submit an affidavit provided by a health care provider from whom the person has received treatment stating that the person has undergone clinically appropriate treatment for the purpose of gender transition but shall not include any requirement for evidence or documentation of any medical procedure.
Title
Birth certificates; change of sex.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102581D |