VA HB403 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prior sex offenses admissible in evidence; sex crimes against child. Provides that in a criminal case in which the defendant is accused of a felony sexual offense involving a child victim, evidence of the defendant's conviction of another sexual offense or offenses is admissible and may be considered for its bearing on any matter to which it is relevant. This rule of evidence is to be applied in conjunction with the Virginia Rules of Evidence.
Title
Child sex-crime cases; admission of prior sexual offenses into evidence.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0782) | |
2014-04-23 | House | Enacted, Chapter 782 (effective 7/1/14) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB403ER2) |
2014-04-23 | House | Reenrolled |
2014-04-23 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-23 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-03-27 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2014-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB403ER) |
2014-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 2-N) |
2014-03-03 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (91-Y 2-N) |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-11 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (92-Y 6-N) |
2014-02-10 | House | Printed as engrossed 14102766D-E |
2014-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB403E |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102766D |