VA HB401 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibited discrimination; sexual orientation and gender identity. Prohibits discrimination in employment, public accommodation, public contracting, apprenticeship programs, housing, banking, and insurance on the basis of sexual orientation or gender identity. The bill codifies existing prohibited discrimination in public employment on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, or status as a veteran and adds discrimination based on sexual orientation or gender identity to the list of unlawful discriminatory housing practices. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discrimination; sexual orientation and gender identity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in General Laws
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N)
2018-02-07HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2018-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101020D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521131(n/a)See Bill Text
1521500.1(n/a)See Bill Text
1521507(n/a)See Bill Text
1521604(n/a)See Bill Text
152853(n/a)See Bill Text
152854(n/a)See Bill Text
152965(n/a)See Bill Text
222901.1(n/a)See Bill Text
223004(n/a)See Bill Text
223900(n/a)See Bill Text
223903(n/a)See Bill Text
224200(n/a)See Bill Text
224201(n/a)See Bill Text
224310(n/a)See Bill Text
224311(n/a)See Bill Text
224343.1(n/a)See Bill Text
221295.2(n/a)See Bill Text
221306(n/a)See Bill Text
2311017(n/a)See Bill Text
3822114(n/a)See Bill Text
3822115(n/a)See Bill Text
3822212(n/a)See Bill Text
3822213(n/a)See Bill Text
41101.05(n/a)See Bill Text
401121(n/a)See Bill Text
62501(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback