VA HB40 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-11 - Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public safety answering points; deployment of text-to-9-1-1. Requires each public safety answering point (PSAP) by July 1, 2019, to be able to receive and process calls for emergency assistance sent via text message.
Title
Public safety answering points; deployment of text-to-9-1-1.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-02-02 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2015-11-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100406D |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB40 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB40+hil |