VA HB4 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-28 - Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Plastic bag tax; distribution to towns. Provides that any town located within a county that has imposed a disposable plastic bag tax shall receive a distribution of revenues collected by the county based on the local sales tax distribution formula for appropriations to towns. The bill requires that towns use such revenues for the same purposes allowable for a county or city.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Plastic bag tax; distribution to towns.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N) (Y: 52 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-28SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 17-N)
2024-02-28SenateRead third time
2024-02-27SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (11-Y 4-N)
2024-02-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2024-02-09SenateReferred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
2024-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2024-02-08HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 45-N)
2024-02-08HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 45-N)
2024-02-07HouseRead second time and engrossed
2024-02-06HouseRead first time
2024-02-02HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (13-Y 9-N)
2024-02-02HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N)
2024-01-23HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
2024-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2024-01-16HouseReferred from Labor and Commerce by voice vote
2023-11-27HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2023-11-27HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100184D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5811745(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback