VA HB399 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Punishment for conviction of second or subsequent misdemeanor larceny; penalties. Provides that any person convicted of a second larceny offense shall be confined in jail not less than 30 days nor more than 12 months and that for a third or any subsequent larceny offense, such person is guilty of a Class 6 felony.
Title
Larceny; punishment for conviction of second or subsequent misdemeanor, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Tim Griffin [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24103406D |