VA HB393 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Judgment payment required to be noted by creditor; penalty. Provides that payment by a debtor shall be entered on the judgment docket by the creditor within 90 days of payment of a judgment or within 10 days of being notified of satisfaction. The bill also provides that the judgment creditor shall be liable for a fine of $100 as well as the cost of releasing the judgment if he fails to enter such payment under such terms. Under current law, the judgment creditor is only subject to a $50 fine for failure to enter judgment within 10 days after receiving notice of satisfaction.
Title
Judgment; payment required to be noted by creditor, penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0274) | |
2014-03-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 274 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB393ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB393H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14103764D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 14103764D-H1 |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101689D |