VA HB389 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unemployment compensation; voluntary separation presumed. Establishes a rebuttable presumption that an individual left work voluntarily if the individual was a graduate student whose employment commenced and ended between spring and fall semesters of his academic program and he returned to his academic program following his separation from employment.
Title
Unemployment compensation; voluntary separation presumed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0201) | |
2014-03-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 201 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB389ER) |
2014-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (16-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103208D |