VA HB389 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 4 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Allocation of maintenance funds among highway systems. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to utilize the estimated budget required to meet performance standards for asset management under § 33.1-13.02 in determining the total amount of funds that are reasonable and necessary for maintenance of roads; the allocation of the total amount of funds made available for maintenance shall be based on achieving a minimal level of disparity in meeting asset management performance standards established under § 33.1-13.02; such provision to be fully implemented by fiscal year 2015.
Title
Highway systems; allocation of maintenance funds.
Sponsors
Del. David Bulova [D] | Sen. Dave Marsden [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Thomas Rust [R] |
Del. Vivian Watts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-07 | House: Assigned App. sub: Transportation (May) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-05 | House: Referred from Transportation by voice vote | |
2008-01-14 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: 1 | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088103444 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB389 |