VA HB384 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of government; rights of state and local employees; freedoms of conscience and expression. Protects state and local government employees of the Commonwealth, defined in the bill, from being penalized by their employer for expressing their opinion regarding a current or proposed regulation, rule, policy, position, or other action or purpose of a unit of state or local government at a hearing of a public body during the time designated for public comment when such employees are speaking on their own behalf as members of the public. Administration of government; rights of state and local employees; freedoms of conscience and expression. Protects state and local government employees of the Commonwealth, defined in the bill, from being penalized by their employer for expressing their opinion regarding a current or proposed regulation, rule, policy, position, or other action or purpose of a unit of state or local government at a hearing of a public body during the time designated for public comment when such employees are speaking on their own behalf as members of the public.
Title
State and local employees; rights of employees, freedoms of conscience and expression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N 1-A) (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2022-04-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., May 27, 2022 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Communicated to Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (19-Y 21-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 47-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (53-Y 47-N) |
2022-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's substitute printed 22108053D-H3 |
2022-04-11 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB384ER) |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (26-Y 14-N) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (72-Y 27-N 1-A) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (72-Y 27-N 1-A) |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB384H2 |
2022-02-14 | House | Substitute by Delegate Davis agreed to 22106607D-H2 |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee on General Laws substitute rejected 22106316D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | House | Floor substitute printed 22106607D-H2 (Davis) |
2022-02-11 | House | Passed by for the day |
2022-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 22106316D-H1 |
2022-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 9-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102325D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1512.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2902.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |