VA HB384 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local mandates; identification of sources of funding. Requires the assessment performed by state agencies to include the identification of sources of funding for the mandate.
Title
Local mandates; identification of sources of funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102585D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB384 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB384+hil |