VA HB382 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Property Owners' Association Act; statement of lot owner rights. Provides that, pursuant to the Property Owners' Association Act, every lot owner who is a member in good standing of a property owners' association shall have (i) the equal right to present use and enjoyment of the property, (ii) the right to serve on the board of directors and to carry out one's specific duties with the same rights and privileges as other board members, and (iii) the right to have notice of any pending or probable litigation involving the association.
Title
Property Owners' Association Act; statement of lot owner rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104114D |