VA HB382 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund; grant program. Changes the Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund (the Fund) from a lending program to a grant program. The bill directs the Fund to grant money to localities to enable them to offer cost-sharing programs to help residents and businesses that are subject to recurrent flooding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Shoreline Resiliency Fund; grant program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseLeft in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2020-01-02HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-02HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101699D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101603.25(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback