VA HB380 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local license taxes; elimination of authority to impose. Prohibits any county, city, or town from imposing any license tax or fee in any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 2023. The bill does not apply to any severance tax that is levied as a license tax.
Title
License taxes, local; elimination of authority to impose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Finance |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22100093D |