VA HB377 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal law; restoration of firearms rights; report to State Police. Provides a mechanism for reporting to the Department of State Police when a circuit court restores a felon's right to possess, transport, and carry a firearm, ammunition for a firearm, or a stun weapon. The bill provides that prior to entry of a restoration order, the petitioner's fingerprints and petition shall be sent to the Central Criminal Records Exchange (CCRE), which shall forward the petitioner's criminal history record information to the court, which shall inform the attorney for the Commonwealth that the criminal history record information is available for review. If the order is issued, the Department of State Police shall enter the petitioner's name and description in the CCRE so that law-enforcement personnel accessing the CCRE will be aware of the order's existence.
Title
Felons; restoration of firearms rights, report to State Police.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2016-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-03 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104972D-H1 |
2016-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100973D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |