VA HB370 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Board of zoning appeals; dual office holding. Authorizes a member of a board of zoning appeals to be appointed to also serve as an officer of election.
Title
Zoning appeals, board of; dual office holding.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0011) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 11 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 25, 2020 | |
2020-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2020 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB370ER) |
2020-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-30 | House | VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-24 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Land Use |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102288D |
Same As/Similar To
SB292 (Same As) 2020-04-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1006)