VA SB292 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 15 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-16 - Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Board of zoning appeals; dual office holding. Authorizes a member of a board of zoning appeals to be appointed to also serve as an officer of election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning appeals, Board of; dual office holding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate: Read third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional readings dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-16SenateRead third time and passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2020-01-15SenateRead second time and engrossed
2020-01-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2020-01-13SenateReported from Local Government (12-Y 1-N)
2020-01-03SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-01-03SenatePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101853D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522308(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback