VA HB360 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500)
Summary
Nonpoint source reduction funding. Authorizes the Governor and General Assembly to provide additional funding in excess of the amount deposited in the Water Quality Improvement Fund from a budget surplus to fund nonpoint source pollution reduction activities. This bill is identical to
Title
Nonpoint source pollution reduction; Governor and General Assembly to provide funding therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0500) | |
2008-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 500 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB360ER) | |
2008-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-27 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (24-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Assigned App. sub: Economic Development, Agriculture and Natural Resources(Cox) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-16 | House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083936822 |
Same As/Similar To
SB513 (Same As) 2010-03-14 - House: Left in General Laws
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB360 |