VA HB351 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; party identification on ballots; local elections. Gives candidates in local elections the option to be identified by party on the ballot. Currently, only federal, statewide, and General Assembly candidates who are nominated by a political party or in a primary are required to be identified by party on the ballot.
Title
Party identification on ballots; gives candidates in local elections option.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-23 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2012-01-12 | House: Assigned P & E sub: Constitutional Amendments Subcommittee | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12103719D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB351 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB351+hil |