VA HB344 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Displacement of private waste companies. Reduces from five years to one year the period of time a locality must provide notice to a private waste company before the locality engages in the actual provision of the waste service that displaces the company.
Title
Private waste companies; displacement.
Sponsors
Del. Chad Green [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101262D |