VA HB342 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Meals tax and county food and beverage tax; exemption for farmers market and roadside stand sales up to $2,500. Exempts from meals tax, which may be imposed by any city or town, and food and beverage tax, which may be imposed by any county, sales by sellers at local farmers markets and roadside stands when such sellers' annual income from such sales does not exceed $2,500. The bill defines such sellers' annual income as income from sales at all local farmer's markets and roadside stands, not just those sales occurring in the locality imposing the tax.
Title
Meals tax and county food and beverage tax; exemption for farmers market and roadside stand sales.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0241) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 241 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-03 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020 | |
2020-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB342ER) |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 20100190D-E |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB342E |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (9-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100190D |