VA HB339 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Debt Collection Act; public institutions of higher education. Requires a public institution of higher education to provide a debtor who is currently enrolled in such institution the option to pay his debt in periodic payments over the course of the term or semester in which the account became past due or, at the discretion of such institution, over a longer period, provided that such periodic payments are promptly paid until the account is satisfied.
Title
Va. Debt Collection Act; public higher educational institutions, payment of student debt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0386) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 386 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB339ER) |
2018-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Finance (15-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-06 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100867D |