VA HB333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB333
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Minimum Wage Act; exclusions. Eliminates the exclusion in the Virginia Minimum Wage Act for persons whose earning capacity is impaired by physical deficiency, mental illness, or intellectual disability. Virginia Minimum Wage Act; exclusions. Eliminates the exclusion in the Virginia Minimum Wage Act for persons whose earning capacity is impaired by physical deficiency, mental illness, or intellectual disability.
Title
Virginia Minimum Wage Act; exclusions.
Sponsors
Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-04 | Senate | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Continued to 2021 in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 14-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB333H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106980D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106980D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102076D |
Same As/Similar To
HB333 (Carry Over) 2020-02-17 - Continued to 2021 in Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N 1-A)