VA HB332 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Education; pilot program; reading diagnostic tests and instruction. Requires the Department of Education to develop and implement a geographically representative two-year pilot program to administer reading diagnostic tests that include all components of a normed rapid automatized naming test. The bill requires each local school division in the pilot program to provide evidence-based instruction, including structured literacy instruction, to students in kindergarten through grade three who fall below the benchmark on any such reading diagnostic test or demonstrate deficiencies based on their individual performance on the Standards of Learning reading test. The bill requires the Department of Education to report to the Governor and General Assembly, no later than December 1, 2022, on the outcomes of the pilot program and the necessary resources for statewide implementation of such tests and instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reading diagnostic tests; DOE to develop and implement a pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-27SenateContinued to 2021 in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2020-02-18SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2020-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-11HouseVOTE: Passage (95-Y 5-N)
2020-02-11HouseRead third time and passed House (95-Y 5-N)
2020-02-10HouseEngrossed by House - floor substitute HB332H2
2020-02-10HouseSubstitute by Delegate Hope agreed to 20108096D-H2
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Appropriations substitute rejected 20107911D-H1
2020-02-10HouseCommittee on Education amendments rejected
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-10HouseFloor substitute printed 20108096D-H2 (Hope)
2020-02-10HousePassed by temporarily
2020-02-10HouseRead second time
2020-02-09HouseRead first time
2020-02-07HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-02-07HouseCommittee substitute printed 20107911D-H1
2020-02-07HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N)
2020-02-05HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2020-02-05HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-05HouseReported from Education with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2020-02-03HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N)
2020-01-13HouseAssigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ
2020-01-01HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2020-01-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103248D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB332
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB332+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB332H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB332H2+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0903V0036+HB0332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H09V0142+HB0332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0203V0025+HB0332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0225+HB0332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H02V0268+HB0332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0790+HB0332
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S04V0333+HB0332

Bill Comments

feedback