VA HB332 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Common Interest Community Ombudsman; owners' bill of rights. Provides that in addition to other powers and duties, the Common Interest Community Ombudsman is required to develop and disseminate to all common interest communities in Virginia a common interest community owners' bill of rights, which shall be written in readily understandable language using words of common everyday usage and avoiding legal terms and phrases. The bill requires the Ombudsman also to post a copy of the common interest community owners' bill of rights on its website. The bill sets out the minimum requirements for inclusion in the bill of rights.
Title
Common Interest Community Ombudsman; owners' bill of rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102731D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB332 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB332+hil |