VA HB319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Preschool Initiative; enrollment. Permits any local school board to offer any slots in its Virginia Preschool Initiative program that remain unfilled by at-risk students after initial enrollment to students who reside in the school division and meet the age requirements but do not qualify as at-risk and to charge a fee for such enrollment.
Title
Virginia Preschool Initiative program; enrollment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (6-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2018-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101052D |