VA HB316 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Teachers; probation and dismissal. Specifies that a teacher may be placed on probation for incompetency, immorality, noncompliance with school laws and regulations, disability as shown by competent medical evidence when in compliance with federal law, conviction of a felony or a crime of moral turpitude, or other good and just cause. The bill replaces the current condition constituting incompetency, for the purposes of teacher employment, of one or more unsatisfactory performance evaluations with the condition of more than one unsatisfactory performance evaluation or one unsatisfactory performance evaluation coupled with a finding by the division superintendent that the teacher (i) exhibited a pattern of poor performance or (ii) failed to respond to efforts to improve his performance. The bill extends from five business days to 15 business days the deadline for a teacher to request a hearing after receiving written notice of a recommendation of dismissal. The bill also staggers by 10 days (a) the opportunity for a teacher recommended for dismissal to inspect and copy his personnel file and all other documents relied upon in reaching the decision to recommend dismissal and (b) the opportunity for the division superintendent to inspect and copy the documents to be offered in rebuttal to the decision to recommend dismissal. The bill also extends from 15 business days to 30 business days the deadline for the school board or hearing officer to set a hearing after a request by a teacher recommended for dismissal.
Title
Teachers; probation and dismissal.
Sponsors
Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Education |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100370D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 307 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 311 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 313 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |