VA HB315 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation police officers; retirement. Provides that any conservation police officer who (i) has at least 20 years of service as a conservation police officer, (ii) is a full-time sworn conservation police officer prior to January 1, 2016, and (iii) was transitioned to a civilian position on January 1, 2016, shall be considered a retired law-enforcement officer for the purposes of (a) obtaining a photo identification card, (b) being excluded from the prohibition on carrying concealed weapons and fee for a concealed handgun permit, and (c) purchasing a service weapon.
Title
Conservation police officers; certain officers of Department of Game and Inland Fisheries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0041) | |
2016-02-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 41 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-02-19 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 26, 2016 | |
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/19/16 |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB315ER) |
2016-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-01 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-29 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB315H1 |
2016-01-29 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104471D-H1 |
2016-01-29 | House | Read second time |
2016-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-27 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104471D-H1 |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources |
2016-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102272D |