VA HB3 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 38-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Dual enrollment courses; quality standards; transfer course credit. Requires the State Board for Community Colleges, in coordination with the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, the Department of Education, and the Virginia Association of School Superintendents, to develop and implement (i) a plan to achieve and maintain the same standards regarding quality, consistency, and level of evaluation and review for dual enrollment courses offered by local school divisions as are required for all courses taught in the Virginia Community College System and (ii) a process and criteria for determining whether any dual enrollment course offered in the Commonwealth that meets or exceeds such standards is transferable to a public institution of higher education as (a) a uniform certificate of general studies program or passport program course credit, (b) a general elective course credit, or (c) a course credit meeting other academic requirements of a public institution of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dual enrollment courses; quality, consistency, etc., of courses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-10 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-06 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0787)
2018-04-06 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 787 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
2018-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President
2018-03-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-03-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB3ER)
2018-03-20HouseEnrolled
2018-03-10HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2018-03-10HouseConference substitute printed 18108277D-H1
2018-03-10 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Suetterlein, Barker
2018-03-08SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2018-03-08HouseDelegates: Landes, Jones, S.C., Keam
2018-03-08HouseConferees appointed by House
2018-03-08HouseHouse acceded to request
2018-03-08SenateSenate requested conference committee
2018-03-08SenateSenate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-07HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2018-03-07HouseSenate substitute with amendment rejected by House 18107905D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2018-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar
2018-03-06SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2018-03-06SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB3S1
2018-03-06SenateAmendment by Senator Newman agreed to
2018-03-06SenateReading of amendment waived
2018-03-06SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 18107905D-S1
2018-03-06SenateReading of substitute waived
2018-03-06SenateRead third time
2018-03-05SenatePassed by for the day
2018-03-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2018-03-01SenateCommittee substitute printed 18107905D-S1
2018-03-01SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2018-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2018-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-02-06HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2018-02-05HouseRead second time and engrossed
2018-02-02HouseRead first time
2018-01-31HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2018-01-24HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-24HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2018-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-11-20HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2017-11-20HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100917D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231905.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB3
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB3+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB3S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB3H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB3ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0787+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0903V0001+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H09V0012+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H0206V0009+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H02V0008+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0348+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S04V0308+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0862HB0003+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0973HB0003+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1451+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1059HB0003+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV1192HB0003+HB0003
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV1552+HB0003

Bill Comments

feedback