VA HB296 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Transition of towns to cities. Makes an exception to the current moratorium on the granting of new city charters by allowing towns with a population of greater than 50,000 that are transitioning to city status to seek a city charter. The bill contains a technical amendment.
Title
Towns; transition to cities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Charters |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100934D |