VA HB296 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plans; alignment of transportation services with accessible housing and other community services. Requires localities to take into consideration how to align transportation infrastructure and facilities with affordable, accessible housing and community services when developing the transportation component of the comprehensive plan for the physical development of the territory. The bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia Disability Commission and is identical to
Title
Comprehensive plans; alignment of transportation infrastructure and facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB296ER) |
2014-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-22 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100343D-E |
2014-01-21 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB296E |
2014-01-21 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-21 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-20 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-17 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: #2 |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100343D |