VA HB292 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School boards and local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding; frequency of review and public input. Shortens from every five years to every two years the frequency of the review period for memorandums of understanding between school boards and local law-enforcement agencies. The bill also requires local school boards to conspicuously publish the current division memorandum of understanding on its division website and provide notice and opportunity for public input during each memorandum of understanding review period.
Title
School boards and local law-enforcement agencies; memorandums of understanding, frequency of review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) (Y: 88 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB292ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (88-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 11-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB292H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106898D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106898D-H1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporates HB1135 (Lopez) |
2020-01-29 | House | Incorporates HB897 (Guzman) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned Education sub: Pre-K-12 |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102225D |
Same As/Similar To
HB897 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
HB1135 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
SB221 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
HB1135 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Incorporated by Education
SB221 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)