VA HB292 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-02 - House: Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Termination of parental rights; original jurisdiction; circuit court. Provides that the circuit courts shall have original and general jurisdiction over all cases involving the termination of residual parental rights and eliminates the juvenile and domestic relations district courts' concurrent jurisdiction over such cases.
Title
Circuit courts; shall have original and general jurisdiction over certain cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-02 | House: Left in Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-03 | House: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice by voice vote | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 by voice vote | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101655D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 276.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 296 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+sum+HB292 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?111+ful+HB292+hil |