VA HB287 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; STOP GUN VIOLENCE. Authorizes the issuance of special license plates for supporters of stopping gun violence bearing the legend STOP GUN VIOLENCE with an expiration date of July 1, 2020. The bill also authorizes the issuance of revenue-sharing special license plates for supporters of stopping gun violence bearing the legend STOP GUN VIOLENCE with a delayed effective date of July 1, 2020.
Title
License plates, special; STOP GUN VIOLENCE.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N 1-A) (Y: 2 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N 1-A) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N 1-A) (Y: 2 N: 95 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N 1-A) (Y: 89 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N) (Y: 50 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0737) | |
2018-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 737 (effective - see bill) | |
2018-03-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB287ER) |
2018-03-20 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2018-03-09 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (83-Y 13-N 1-A) |
2018-03-09 | House | Conference substitute printed 18107454D-H2 |
2018-03-09 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senators: DeSteph, Cosgrove, Peake |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2018-03-05 | House | Delegates: Simon, Gilbert, Fariss |
2018-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2018-03-05 | House | House acceded to request |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-28 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 95-N 1-A) |
2018-02-28 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 18107400D-S1 (2-Y 95-N 1-A) |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB287S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 18107400D-S1 |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 18107400D-S1 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (89-Y 8-N 1-A) |
2018-02-02 | House | Passed House (89-Y 8-N 1-A) |
2018-02-02 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (88-Y 9-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100920D-E |
2018-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB287E |
2018-02-01 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (50-Y 48-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendments by Delegate Fariss agreed to (50-Y 48-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Amendments by Delegate Fariss out of order |
2018-02-01 | House | Substitute by Delegate Simon passed by 18106392D-H1 |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-31 | House | Floor substitute printed 18106392D-H1 (Simon) |
2018-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-29 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2018-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation (18-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100920D |