VA HB282 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
FOIA; exclusion pursuant to nondisclosure agreement. Requires that a nondisclosure agreement by a public body be approved at an open meeting if it is to serve as the basis for an exclusion from the provisions of the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) of confidential proprietary records of a private business. Such an approval must be renewed at least every three months at further open meetings if it is to continue to supply the basis for the FOIA exclusion.
Title
FOIA; exclusion pursuant to nondisclosure agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2016-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101209D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB282 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB282+hil |