VA HB2814 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Economic Opportunity for Virginians in Aspiring and Diverse Communities. Extends the sunset date of the Commission from July 1, 2019, to July 1, 2020.
Title
Economic Opportunity for Virginians in Aspiring & Diverse Communities, Commission on; extends sunset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0525) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 525 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2814ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: McDougle, Norment, Saslaw |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Morefield, Miyares, Torian |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Rules with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2019-01-30 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19106157D |
2019-01-30 | House | Unanimous consent to introduce |