VA HB2798 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
All-Payer Claims Database; penalty. Requires the Commissioner of Health, in cooperation with the Bureau of Insurance, to collect health claims data from certain insurers, corporations, managed care organizations, third-party administrators, and any self-funded employee welfare benefit plans (ERISA plans) whose employer has opted-in to the All-Payer Claims Database, the Department of Medical Assistance Services, state government health insurance plans, local government health insurance plans, and federal health insurance plans. The bill provides that employers that maintain an ERISA plan may opt-in to participate in the All-Payer Claims Database and provides a process for such agreement. The bill adds members to the advisory committee to the nonprofit organization that administers the All-Payer Claims Database. The bill requires the Commissioner of Health to establish a data release committee to review and approve requests for access to data and prohibits the release of data without the approval of such committee. The bill requires the nonprofit organization to ensure that data is timely submitted to the All-Payer Claims Database and authorizes the Board of Health to assess a civil penalty on entities not in compliance. This bill is identical to SB 1216.
Title
All-Payer Claims Database; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0673) | |
2019-03-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 673 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2798ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-22 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senators: Newman, Dunnavant, Barker |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Rules suspended (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Delegates: Garrett, Orrock, James |
2019-02-13 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-13 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2798H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105677D-H1 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-29 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105677D-H1 |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104575D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 276.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
32 | 1 | 276.7:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |