VA HB2792 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Electric utilities; municipal net energy metering. Directs the State Corporation Commission to establish a pilot program that affords the opportunity for any locality to participate in net energy metering if it is a retail customer of a certain type of investor-owned electric utility. In order to qualify for the program, the locality is required to own and operate a renewable generating facility with a generating capacity of not more than two megawatts that is located on the municipality's premises and is intended primarily to offset all or part of the locality's own electricity requirements. Under the pilot program, a municipal customer-generator that generates electricity in amounts that exceed the amount of electricity consumed by the municipal customer-generator, determined annually, to credit one or more of the municipality's target metered accounts in order that the generation energy charges on the electric bills of the target's metered accounts are reduced by the amount of excess generation kilowatt hours apportioned to the metered account multiplied by the applicable generation energy rate of the target's accounts. In Appalachian Power's service territory, metered accounts of the public school division of a locality may be target accounts. The amount of generating capacity of all generating facilities that are the subject of a pilot program are limited to (i) five megawatts if Appalachian Power is the pilot program utility, though the utility may increase the amount to up to 10 megawatts or (ii) 25 megawatts if Dominion Power is the pilot program utility. Such aggregated capacities of the generation facilities that are the subject of a pilot program constitute a portion of the existing limit of the utility's adjusted Virginia peak-load forecast of the previous year that is available to municipal customer-generators, eligible customer-generators, eligible agricultural customer-generators, and small agricultural generators in the utility's service area. The duration of the pilot program is six years. This bill is identical to SB 1779.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Electric utilities; municipal net energy metering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)
2019-03-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 746 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2792ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (78-Y 21-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (78-Y 21-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2792H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106229D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106229D-H1
2019-01-31HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19104713D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2792
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2792+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2792H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2792ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0746+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1403V0017+HB2792
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0072+HB2792
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2496+HB2792
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0134+HB2792
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2792+HB2792
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0653HB2792+HB2792

Bill Comments

feedback